IN HB1197 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
Pending: Senate Homeland Security & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Hoosier Spirit II designated state aircraft. Specifies that the P-47 Thunderbolt known as the Hoosier Spirit II is designated as the official state aircraft of Indiana. (Current law designates the P-47 Thunderbolt as the official state aircraft of Indiana.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hoosier Spirit II designated state aircraft.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2021-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Becker
2021-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 13: yeas 95, nays 0
2021-01-26HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2021-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representatives Hostettler, Sullivan, Negele
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1197/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/6/4/1c64069b/HB1197.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/c/5/96c59d33/HB1197.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/f/6/94f6a679/HB1197.02.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/c/0/7cc01432/HB1197.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/1/6/a3169baf/HB1197.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/6/5/7b650c14/HB1197.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/f/4/aff44b11/HB1197.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/7/9/fd79826d/HB1197.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/8/4/80848509/HB1197.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/7/6/5076a887/HB1197.13_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback