IN HB1194 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the reinstatement rights of a laid off member of a city police or fire department, or a laid off member of a sheriff's department, terminates five years (instead of three years) after the day on which the member's layoff begins.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public safety officer layoff and reinstatement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 56
2010-03-12 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-08 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-01 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-02-25 Signed by the Speaker
2010-02-18 Returned to the House without amendments
2010-02-18 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 182: Yeas 48 and Nays 0
2010-02-15 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-11 Senator Buck added as third sponsor
2010-02-11 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2010-01-26 Senate sponsors: Senators M. Young and Errington
2010-01-26 Referred to the Senate
2010-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 78: Yeas 94, Nays 0
2010-01-25 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-20 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-19 Representatives Bell, Riecken and Niezgodski added as coauthors
2010-01-07 First reading: referred to Committee on Labor and Employment
2010-01-07 Authored by Representative Tyler

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback