IN HB1190 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 179
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Overweight truck permits. Removes the list of commodities and the specific weight limitations for certain commodities from the definition of "overweight divisible load". Provides that the Indiana department of transportation (department) may issue an overweight permit for transporting overweight vehicles and loads carrying resources on certain highways in the state highway system. Provides that a deviation from an approved route constitutes a violation subject to a civil penalty. Provides that not more than 8,500 single trip permits may be issued annually for applicants with a total equivalent single axle load calculation of more than 2.40 equivalent single axle load credit. Provides that the trip permit limit and trip weight limit do not include overweight divisible load permits obtained by shippers and carriers that obtained permits before January 1, 2021. Provides that the department may temporarily increase the number of overweight divisible load permits issued by order of the commissioner in response to an emergency or changes in market conditions. Provides that the department may limit the number of overweight divisible load permits issued to an individual applicant. Requires the department to adopt rules due to lack of transportation options for certain resources, supply chain interruptions, or supply dock backlogs. Provides that the department shall issue a report to the legislative council and the interim study committee on roads and transportation regarding the fee structure of overweight divisible load permits, and regarding the impact of overweight divisible loads on roads and highways by July 1, 2023. Provides that the department shall issue an annual report to the legislative council and the interim study committee on roads and transportation regarding market fluctuation in the number of overweight divisible load permits issued during the previous year. Provides that the Indiana state police department shall issue an annual report to the legislative council and the interim study committee on roads and transportation regarding the number of accidents involving applicants permitted for overweight divisible loads. Provides that a local authority may grant permits for transporting overweight divisible loads on local streets under the control of the local authority. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Overweight truck permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 56 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HousePublic Law 179
2021-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-22HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-21SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 475: yeas 27, nays 22
2021-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 477: yeas 58, nays 30
2021-04-20SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2021-04-20HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2021-04-20SenateSenator Garten added as conferee
2021-04-20SenateSenator Niezgodski removed as conferee
2021-04-20HouseRepresentative Heine added as conferee
2021-04-20HouseRepresentative Moseley removed as conferee
2021-04-19SenateSenator Niezgodski added as conferee
2021-04-19SenateSenator Ford J.D. removed as conferee
2021-04-19SenateSenator Niezgodski removed as advisor
2021-04-14SenateSenate advisors appointed: Bohacek and Niezgodski
2021-04-14SenateSenate conferees appointed: Ford Jon and Ford J.D.
2021-04-14HouseHouse advisors appointed: Soliday, Heaton, Johnson and Pfaff
2021-04-14HouseHouse conferees appointed: Pressel and Moseley
2021-04-14HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2021-04-14HouseMotion to dissent filed
2021-04-14SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-13SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 416: yeas 30, nays 19
2021-04-12SenateSenator Grooms added as second sponsor
2021-04-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-04-01SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2021-03-18SenateSenator Bohacek added as cosponsor
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Ford Jon
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 225: yeas 57, nays 35
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #1 (Pressel) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-17HouseRepresentative Heaton added as coauthor
2021-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2021-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representative Soliday
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Pressel

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1190/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/6/f/b66f07be/HB1190.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/b/8/a4b8e890/HB1190.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/b/3/28b3b518/HB1190.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/8/c/d08ce400/HB1190.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/8/5/6885180c/HB1190.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/b/d/12bd68dc/HB1190.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/7/0/cb708e8e/HB1190.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/a/8/e3a87742/HB1190.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/d/5/e0d51a7a/HB1190.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/4/0/9e40b533/HB1190.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/9/8/c59867b8/HB1190.04.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/5/2/a2524684/HB1190.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/9/5/7395a0ca/HB1190.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/e/2/d9e2ccd4/HB1190.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/e/0/68e0b20d/HB1190.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/d/d/48dd75d0/HB1190.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/f/d/7afd75a9/HB1190.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/1/d/391dd054/HB1190.03.ENGH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/a/c/fbacda52/HB1190.04.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/4/b/7f4bd268/HB1190.04.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/5/9/49593390/HB1190.04.COMS.DIS01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/1/b/e81b86fd/HB1190.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/7/7/d5770979/HB1190.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/3/6/1d3607a0/HB1190.225_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/7/f/f07f22ce/HB1190.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/7/e/1b7e36ea/HB1190.416_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/3/c/d33cff91/HB1190.477_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/1/6/5616d8e0/HB1190.475_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback