IN HB1187 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Public Law 213
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that a municipal utility's offering or providing of water or wastewater service in an area outside the corporate boundaries of the utility's municipality is under the jurisdiction of the Indiana utility regulatory commission (IURC) under certain circumstances. Establishes criteria that the IURC must consider in resolving service disputes involving municipal utilities. Provides that the IURC may recover from a municipal utility costs associated with an investigation concerning utility service outside the corporate boundaries of the municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal utility service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environmental Affairs - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 118701 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HousePublic Law 213
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-13SenateConference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 422: yeas 44 and nays 1
2014-03-12HouseRepresentative Koch added as coauthor.
2014-03-12HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 481: yeas 95 and nays 0
2014-03-05SenateSenator Hershman added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Randolph added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Merritt added as advisor
2014-03-05SenateSenator Stoops added as conferee
2014-03-05SenateSenator Charbonneau added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Niezgodski added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Morris added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Sullivan added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Koch added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Eberhart added as advisor
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative GiaQuinta added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseRepresentative Bacon added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 308: yeas 47 and nays 1
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-02-27SenateHB 1187 Amendment #1 (Charbonneau), prevailed.
2014-02-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-11SenateReassigned to Environmental Affairs, pursuant to rule 68(b)
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Local Government
2014-01-30HouseSenator Charbonneau added as sponsor.
2014-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-30HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 149: yeas 85 and nays 10
2014-01-30HouseRepresentative Heuer added as coauthor.
2014-01-29HouseHB 1187 Amendment #1 (Smith, V.), prevailed.
2014-01-29HouseHB 1187 Amendment #2 (Smith, V.) motion withdrawn.
2014-01-29HouseHB 1187 Amendment #5 (Heuer), prevailed.
2014-01-29HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-23HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-01-15HouseRepresentative Niezgodski added as coauthor.
2014-01-15HouseRepresentative Wolkins added as coauthor.
2014-01-14HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Local Government
2014-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Bacon.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1187/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/8/f/8e8f02d1/HB1187.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/e/d/1eed65d2/HB1187.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/d/6/77d6e41e/HB1187.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/6/c/646cb339/HB1187.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/0/7/2707cff7/HB1187.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/a/c/a2ace722/HB1187.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/5/a/1b5a8831/HB1187.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/5/0/80505e70/HB1187.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/f/7/def7b263/HB1187.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/0/1/d701ee0c/HB1187.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/7/a/ff7a19e4/HB1187.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/a/0/41a0763e/HB1187.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/1/8/671822c6/HB1187.03.ENGH.149.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/a/8/3ba84929/HB1187.05.ENGS.308.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/f/9/caf990e9/HB1187.05.ENGS.481.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/2/3/74238cb2/HB1187.05.ENGS.422.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/4/1/f4412021/HB1187.03.ENGH.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback