IN HB1181 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Public Law 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Public Law 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Technical corrections. Resolves technical problems in the Indiana Code. Provides that the technical corrections bill may be referred to as the "technical corrections bill of the 2017 general assembly". Specifies that the title may be used in the lead-in line of each SECTION of another bill to identify the provisions added, amended, or repealed by the technical corrections bill that are also amended or repealed in another bill being considered during the 2017 legislative session. Provides the publisher of the Indiana Code with guidance concerning resolution of amend/repeal conflicts between the technical corrections bill and other bills passed during the
Title
Technical corrections. Resolves technical problems in the Indiana Code. Provides that the technical corrections bill may be referred to as the "technical corrections bill of the 2017 general assembly". Specifies that the title may be used in the lead-in line of each SECTION of another bill to identify the provisions added, amended, or repealed by the technical corrections bill that are also amended or repealed in another bill being considered during the 2017 legislative session. Provides the publisher of the Indiana Code with guidance concerning resolution of amend/repeal conflicts between the technical corrections bill and other bills passed during the
Sponsors
Rep. Clyde Kersey [D] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] | Rep. Thomas Washburne [R] | Rep. Charles Moseley [D] |
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | House | Public Law 85 |
2017-04-20 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 465: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2017-04-11 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 260: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-20 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Young M and Zakas |
2017-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-02-16 | House | Amendment #2 (Kersey) prevailed; voice vote |
2017-02-16 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | Representatives Steuerwald, Washburne, Moseley added as coauthors |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Kersey |