IN HB1178 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Public Law 84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Voter registration opportunity for all motor vehicle transactions. Provides that when an individual transacts business with a license branch, other than for a motor vehicle driver's license, permit, or identification card, the license branch employee assisting the individual shall ask the individual whether the individual wants to register to vote or change the individual's voter registration record. Provides that, if the individual is provided with a paper voter registration application form by the license branch employee, the individual, rather than the license branch, is responsible for filing the form with the appropriate county voter registration office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration opportunity for all motor vehicle transactions. Provides that when an individual transacts business with a license branch, other than for a motor vehicle driver's license, permit, or identification card, the license branch employee assisting the individual shall ask the individual whether the individual wants to register to vote or change the individual's voter registration record. Provides that, if the individual is provided with a paper voter registration application form by the license branch employee, the individual, rather than the license branch, is responsible for filing the form with the appropriate county voter registration office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20HousePublic Law 84
2017-04-20HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 474: yeas 76, nays 0
2017-04-11HouseMotion to concur filed
2017-04-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 337: yeas 47, nays 0
2017-03-30SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-03-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2017-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Becker, Ford and Niezgodski
2017-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 94, nays 0
2017-02-21HouseAmendment #1 (Smith M) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-16HouseRepresentatives Smith, M., Richardson, Judy added as coauthors
2017-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2017-01-09HouseAuthored by Representative Kersey

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1178/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/d/f/41df81b1/HB1178.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/0/1/4301af54/HB1178.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/1/e/a51e4554/HB1178.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/7/a/377a99ec/HB1178.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/c/f/8bcf7fb1/HB1178.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/0/d/cf0d9602/HB1178.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/7/0/b170ac0a/HB1178.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/3/4/523469b7/HB1178.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/5/9/4a596dbb/HB1178.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/6/d/926d4d69/HB1178.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/8/2/4e82d9a7/HB1178.197.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/7/a/9f7a326c/HB1178.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/7/8/3578d7e0/HB1178.337.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/6/f/ff6fa79f/HB1178.474.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback