IN HB1177 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies the manner in which alumni members of the Indiana University board of trustees are elected. Requires all of the members of the board of trustees for Indiana University to be citizens of the United States. Requires a majority of the members of the board of trustees for Indiana University to be residents of Indiana. Allows the board of trustees to hold meetings at the dates, times, and places the board of trustees agrees upon. Repeals a provision concerning emergency appointments to the board of trustees of Indiana University. Requires a majority of the members of the board of trustees of Ball State University to be residents of Indiana.
Title
Boards of trustees for universities.
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Foley [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] | Rep. Peggy Welch [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-26 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 667: yeas 82, nays 4 | |
2011-04-18 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-18 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 370: yeas 48 and nays 1 | |
2011-04-14 | Amendment 1 (Hershman), prevailed; | |
2011-04-14 | Reread second time: amended and ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-12 | Placed back on second reading | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-17 | Senator Eckerty added as cosponsor | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2011-01-20 | Senate sponsors: Senators Bray, Simpson and Wyss | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-01-20 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 16: yeas 96, nays 0 | |
2011-01-18 | Amendment 1 (Noe), prevailed; voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-12 | Representative Pierce added as coauthor | |
2011-01-12 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-10 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-10 | Coauthored by Representatives Koch and Welch | |
2011-01-10 | Authored by Representative Foley |