IN HB1176 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

First steps program. Provides that: (1) a health benefits plan; or (2) an employee health plan; may not require authorization for services specified in a covered individual's individualized family service plan once the individualized family service plan is signed by a physician. Adds habilitative services to the services that are required under the definition of "early intervention services" for purposes of the First Steps program. Provides that a member of the interagency coordinating council (council) shall continue to serve until a successor is appointed. Removes the authority of the governor to designate the chairperson of the council or to call a meeting of the council. Requires the council to annually elect a chairperson and vice chairperson. Provides that, except for members of the general assembly, per diem and travel expenses for council members are governed by the policies and procedures established by the Indiana department of administration and approved by the budget agency. Establishes procedures that the division must follow before making a change to the cost participation schedule under the First Steps program. Establishes a method to determine the rate at which: (1) a provider of the services under the First Steps program; or (2) the division; is reimbursed for providing early intervention services using Current Procedural Terminology (CPT) code rates. Provides that: (1) a health plan information card issued: (A) to an insured by an insurer for a policy of accident and sickness insurance; or (B) to an enrollee by a health maintenance organization (HMO); must indicate the type of health plan that is providing the health benefits and services under the insurance policy or HMO contract; and (2) these requirements apply only to a health plan information card issued: (A) initially to a new insured or new enrollee; or (B) to an insured or enrollee at the time of the insured's or enrollee's policy or contract renewal; after July 1, 2020. Provides that: (1) the electronic database by which an issuer of a policy of accident and sickness insurance, or an administrator of a self insured plan, allows an insured or a provider to verify the coverage or benefits of an insured must indicate: (A) whether health benefits and services under the policy of accident and sickness insurance are provided by the issuer of the policy or by a third party administrator; and (B) whether the policy of accident and sickness insurance is subject to state or federal regulation; and (2) the electronic database by which by which an HMO, or an administrator of benefits and health care services under an HMO contract, allows an enrollee or a provider to verify the coverage or benefits of an enrollee must indicate: (A) whether benefits and health care services under the HMO contract are provided by the HMO or by a third party administrator; and (B) whether the HMO contract is a self funded or fully funded plan. Requires the department of insurance to adopt rules to ensure compliance with certain provisions added by the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

First steps program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 111
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 339: yeas 89, nays 0
2020-03-09HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 296: yeas 47, nays 3
2020-02-27SenateSenator Stoops added as cosponsor
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #2 (Ruckelshaus) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #1 (Ruckelshaus) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-24SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2020-02-24SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2020-01-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-27HouseCosponsor: Senator Breaux
2020-01-27HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Ruckelshaus, Grooms, Houchin
2020-01-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 60: yeas 96, nays 0
2020-01-23HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-14HouseRepresentatives DeVon, Vermilion A, Summers added as coauthors
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1176/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/e/5/f6e5236d/HB1176.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/4/9/76496e5d/HB1176.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/0/d/510d8da9/HB1176.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/f/b/09fbee51/HB1176.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/e/4/80e4e43c/HB1176.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/5/c/5d5c3597/HB1176.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/0/0/3900ddf5/HB1176.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/7/6/0876c15d/HB1176.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/c/8/1bc8b7d2/HB1176.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/8/d/078d2918/HB1176.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/7/9/b2791d0c/HB1176.60_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/0/f/490f187f/HB1176.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/9/8/8598af02/HB1176.296_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/1/2/d8120cc6/HB1176.339_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback