IN HB1174 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 119
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Special death benefit. Requires the long term and short term disability plans for state employees to provide on a biweekly basis, after a seven day elimination period, 100% of qualified wages for a correctional officer employed by the department of correction who is disabled by injuries resulting from certain tortious acts. Requires the state personnel department to amend a section of the Indiana Administrative Code. Provides as follows beginning July 1, 2023: (1) Specifies the meaning of a death in the line of duty as it relates to a county coroner or deputy county coroner. (2) Adds county coroners and deputy county coroners to the list of: (A) public safety officers whose relative receives a special death benefit if the officer dies in the line of duty; and (B) employees who may qualify for a presumption of disability or death in the line of duty. (3) Adds county coroners and deputy county coroners to the list of designated Indiana first responders. Makes conforming technical corrections.
Title
Special death benefit.
Sponsors
Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] | Rep. Thomas Saunders [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Jeff Ellington [R] |
Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Kevin Boehnlein [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Public Law 119 |
2022-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 361: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 365: yeas 94, nays 1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Boots and Qaddoura |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Mishler and Niezgodski |
2022-03-02 | House | House advisors appointed: Saunders, Bartels, Gore and Pack |
2022-03-02 | House | House conferees appointed: VanNatter and Moseley |
2022-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senator Boehnlein added as second sponsor |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senator Boehnlein removed as cosponsor |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 44, nays 0 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senator Boehnlein added as cosponsor |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Representative Ellington added as coauthor |
2022-01-25 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Mishler |
2022-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-13 | House | Representative Bartels added as coauthor |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2022-01-11 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2022-01-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative Saunders |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative VanNatter |