IN HB1172 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Public Law 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Paternity actions. Allows a child, by the child's next friend, to commence a child custody proceeding under certain circumstances. Defines "next friend." Provides that a court having jurisdiction over a child who is the subject of a child in need of services proceeding or juvenile delinquency proceeding has concurrent jurisdiction with a court having jurisdiction over a paternity proceeding for the purpose of establishing or modifying paternity, custody, parenting time, or child support of the child.
Title
Paternity actions.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Dale DeVon [R] | Rep. Carolyn Jackson [D] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Rodney Pol [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Public Law 66 |
2023-04-20 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-03-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 321: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2023-03-27 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 41, nays 2 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-27 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Walker G, Ford Jon, Pol |
2023-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2023-02-23 | House | Representative Steuerwald added as coauthor |
2023-02-23 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Clere |
2023-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives DeVon and Jackson |
Subjects
CHILDREN AND MINORS, Child Support, Custody, and Visitation
CHILDREN AND MINORS, Juvenile Delinquents
CHILDREN AND MINORS, Juvenile Delinquents