IN HB1171 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a county recorder may use the county recorder's records perpetuation fund for all or a portion of the expenses of the recorder's office under specified conditions, including approval by the county fiscal body.
Title
Recorder's record perpetuation fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 117102 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 117101 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 117102 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 117101 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Public Law 125 |
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-04 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed, Roll Call 393: yeas 83 and nays 8 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 242: yeas 30 and nays 17 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Local Government |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Kruse added as second sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Wyss added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 184: yeas 92 and nays 1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative GiaQuinta added as coauthor. |
2014-01-13 | House | First Reading: Referred to Local Government |
2014-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Heuer. |