IN HB1167 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Public Law 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Public Law 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School corporation financial management. Permits money in a school corporation's operations fund at the end of a year to be transferred to the school corporation's rainy day fund. Combines various levies into a single operations fund levy beginning in 2019. Changes provisions concerning the education fund and operations fund. Specifies the items to be included in a school corporation's capital projects plan. Changes the reasons for which a school corporation may appeal to increase the school corporation's operations fund levy for transportation purposes. Requires an appeal to increase or a petition to adjust the maximum operations fund levy for a
Title
School corporation financial management. Permits money in a school corporation's operations fund at the end of a year to be transferred to the school corporation's rainy day fund. Combines various levies into a single operations fund levy beginning in 2019. Changes provisions concerning the education fund and operations fund. Specifies the items to be included in a school corporation's capital projects plan. Changes the reasons for which a school corporation may appeal to increase the school corporation's operations fund levy for transportation purposes. Requires an appeal to increase or a petition to adjust the maximum operations fund levy for a
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] | Rep. Mara Reardon [D] |
Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | Public Law 140 |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2018-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 332: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2018-03-05 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-29 | House | Representative Candelaria Reardon added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Mishler and Bassler |
2018-01-29 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2018-01-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-09 | House | Representative Huston added as coauthor |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative Brown T |
2018-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Cook |