IN HB1165 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 161
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Municipally owned utilities. Specifies that the statute concerning the payment for utility services (other than sewer services) provided by a municipally owned utility to rental property does not allow a municipal legislative body to impose a requirement that the owner of the property must: (1) ensure the creditworthiness of the person occupying the property; or (2) accept responsibility for charges incurred by the person occupying the property; by cosigning an agreement or by any other method.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipally owned utilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Concurrence defeated (Y: 33 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 161
2020-03-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 352: yeas 61, nays 34
2020-03-05HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-03-04HouseConcurrence defeated; Roll Call 307: yeas 33, nays 59
2020-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-28SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-27SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 28, nays 18
2020-02-25SenateSenator Koch added as second sponsor
2020-02-25SenateAmendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 234: yeas 10, nays 36
2020-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
2020-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-29HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Sandlin
2020-01-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 129: yeas 64, nays 31
2020-01-28HouseRepresentatives Pressel, Smaltz, Soliday added as coauthors
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Burton

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1165/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/e/d/84ed000d/HB1165.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/b/b/b0bb4fc1/HB1165.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/3/9/65392701/HB1165.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/d/e/2ede4bcd/HB1165.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/6/b/406b3395/HB1165.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/2/7/a/927ac761/HB1165.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/0/7/11072f53/HB1165.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/3/5/b63590eb/HB1165.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/8/8/85884a2a/HB1165.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/3/3/3/d33394e0/HB1165.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/7/1/c371c7c5/HB1165.129_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/a/3/e0a34824/HB1165.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/2/f/ed2f6306/HB1165.234_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/6/8/4c685db1/HB1165.254_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/6/b/b16b6f66/HB1165.307_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/2/7/592743a3/HB1165.352_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback