IN HB1165 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School buses. Requires a governing body seeking to purchase a school bus or special purpose bus to request information concerning the cost of purchasing a school bus or special purpose bus equipped with 3-point lap and shoulder safety belts. Requires the governing body to hold a public hearing on the costs and benefits of purchasing a school bus or special purpose bus with 3-point lap and shoulder safety belts before voting on whether to purchase a school bus or special purpose bus equipped with 3-point lap and shoulder safety belts. Allows a school corporation to use a portion of a
Title
School buses. Requires a governing body seeking to purchase a school bus or special purpose bus to request information concerning the cost of purchasing a school bus or special purpose bus equipped with 3-point lap and shoulder safety belts. Requires the governing body to hold a public hearing on the costs and benefits of purchasing a school bus or special purpose bus with 3-point lap and shoulder safety belts before voting on whether to purchase a school bus or special purpose bus equipped with 3-point lap and shoulder safety belts. Allows a school corporation to use a portion of a
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | Representative Bartlett added as coauthor |
2018-01-16 | House | Representative Schaibley added as coauthor |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Cook |