IN HB1165 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a veteran's service connected disability benefit is protected from a judicial lien, process, or proceeding to collect a debt.
Title
Exempt veterans' benefits from attachment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 53 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-02-18 | Senators Delph, Holdman and Randolph added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-18 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2010-02-18 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 180: Yeas 48 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-15 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Senators Lanane, Deig, Hume and Errington added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-11 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-25 | Senate sponsors: Senators Wyss and Arnold | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-25 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 48: Yeas 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-01-21 | Amendment 1 (Clere), ruled out of order | |
2010-01-21 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-19 | Representatives Barnes and Ruppel added as coauthors | |
2010-01-19 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | Reassigned to the Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety | |
2010-01-07 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-01-07 | Coauthored by Representative Moseley | |
2010-01-07 | Authored by Representative Tincher |