IN HB1164 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Public Law 20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Northwest Indiana regional planning commission. Requires the most recent federal decennial census to be used (instead of the 2000 decennial census), in determining the weighted vote of a member of the northwestern Indiana regional planning commission.
Title
Northwest Indiana regional planning commission. Requires the most recent federal decennial census to be used (instead of the 2000 decennial census), in determining the weighted vote of a member of the northwestern Indiana regional planning commission.
Sponsors
Rep. William Fine [R] | Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. James Arnold [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Public Law 20 |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 303: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as second sponsor |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Local Government |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | Senator Niemeyer added as sponsor |
2015-02-10 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 112: yeas 68, nays 29 |
2015-02-09 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-01-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative Soliday |
2015-01-12 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2015-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Fine |