IN HB1160 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 216
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 216
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce development pilot programs. Provides that the commission for higher education may establish an education and career support services pilot program to provide career and support services to adult students of state educational institutions. Provides that the office of the secretary of family and social services (FSSA), in consultation with Erskine Green Training Institute and the department of workforce development, may establish a manufacturing workforce training pilot program to provide training and other services to: (1) individuals with intellectual and other developmental disabilities; and (2) incumbent workers who are identified to fill higher paying jobs as a result of increased workforce participation by individuals with intellectual and other developmental disabilities. Specifies requirements and permitted actions for each pilot program. Requires FSSA to amend administrative rules.
Title
Workforce development pilot programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Dale DeVon [R] | Rep. Chuck Goodrich [R] | Rep. Carolyn Jackson [D] |
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Shelli Yoder [D] | Sen. John Crane [R] |
Sen. J.D. Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Public Law 216 |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-27 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 537: yeas 91, nays 3 |
2023-04-27 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Yoder, Garten and Crane |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Ford Jon and Ford J.D. |
2023-04-18 | House | House advisors appointed: DeVon, Goodrich, Greene and Summers |
2023-04-18 | House | House conferees appointed: Clere and Jackson |
2023-04-18 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2023-04-18 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 422: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford Jon) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senators Crane and Ford J.D. added as cosponsors |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-16 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 146: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2023-02-16 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon, Garten, Yoder |
2023-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-30 | House | Representatives DeVon, Goodrich, Jackson added as coauthors |
2023-01-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-11 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2023-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2023-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Clere |
Subjects
LABOR AND EMPLOYMENT, State Department and Agencies
LABOR AND EMPLOYMENT, Work Training
PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES
PILOT PROGRAM
STUDENT ASSISTANCE, LOANS, AND GRANTS
WELFARE, Aid to Families with Dependent Children
WELFARE, Poor Relief
LABOR AND EMPLOYMENT, Work Training
PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES
PILOT PROGRAM
STUDENT ASSISTANCE, LOANS, AND GRANTS
WELFARE, Aid to Families with Dependent Children
WELFARE, Poor Relief