IN HB1150 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Public Law 127
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Overweight divisible loads. Provides that a person who transports a vehicle or combination of vehicles with an overweight divisible load is subject to overweight divisible load permitting. Removes certain requirements regarding transportation of commodities. Provides that the department of transportation may not issue a permit for an overweight divisible load if the owner or operator of the vehicle has not provided the department of state revenue with full payment for the permit prior to transporting the overweight divisible load. Provides that the department of state revenue shall determine the extent of civil penalties for overweight divisible loads under certain conditions. Provides that the civil penalty for each permitting violation for transporting overweight divisible loads is not more than $10,000 for each violation. Provides criminal or civil defenses in certain circumstances. Permits the department to determine at an administrative hearing whether a civil penalty should be assessed or reduced pursuant to a defense. Provides that the department of state revenue may not assess a penalty on a citation for an oversize load after more than one year has passed from the date the person receives the citation. Provides that the costs for storage of an abandoned vehicle with a length of at least 30 feet may not exceed $2,500. Makes technical corrections. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Overweight divisible loads.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - House Floor - (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26HousePublic Law 127
2021-04-26HouseSigned by the Governor
2021-04-26SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 382: yeas 88, nays 0
2021-03-25HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-03-23SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-03-22SenateSenator Leising added as cosponsor
2021-03-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 242: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-03-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-18SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2021-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-02HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Garten and Raatz
2021-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 41: yeas 91, nays 2
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative Young J added as coauthor
2021-02-01HouseAmendment #1 (Prescott) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2021-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representatives Bartels and Pressel
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Prescott

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1150/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/d/4/1ad4ef5b/HB1150.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/f/9/b7f97d6d/HB1150.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/b/0/53b0bd0f/HB1150.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/f/4/5ef4062a/HB1150.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/b/8/c8b8dbc6/HB1150.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/7/5/bb75705e/HB1150.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/4/6/06469d50/HB1150.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/8/2/22827d71/HB1150.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/4/d/a54d07da/HB1150.05.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/f/3/99f3545a/HB1150.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/3/a/583ad2cc/HB1150.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/3/6/fc3601b7/HB1150.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/e/6/e0e6e0a1/HB1150.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/0/c/6a0c88f2/HB1150.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/6/7/9c67318e/HB1150.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/0/0/1500d793/HB1150.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/4/a/a64a4724/HB1150.03.ENGH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/b/a/cbba7bc3/HB1150.04.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/d/c/eedc163b/HB1150.04.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/d/d/a5ddaf6e/HB1150.04.COMS.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/f/0/d6f04954/HB1150.05.ENRS.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/c/e/ccce05ad/HB1150.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/7/4/d274fc87/HB1150.41_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/d/6/a4d683d5/HB1150.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/b/6/2fb6ad6b/HB1150.242_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/4/9/4a492b40/HB1150.382_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback