IN HB1148 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 108
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Board of accountancy. Provides that a candidate for the certified public accountant examination (exam) may not apply for or take the exam prior to meeting certain education requirements. Provides an exception to the application restriction if a candidate applies up to 60 days prior to the candidate's completion of the education requirements. Provides the Indiana board of accountancy (board) may cancel an exam score if a candidate fails to meet certain requirements. Provides that a candidate must attain a grade of at least 75 on the exam. Provides that a candidate may take the required exam sections individually and in any order and that credit for a passed section shall be valid for 18 months. Provides that a candidate must pass all exam sections within a rolling 18 month period and if a candidate does not do so, credit for any section passed outside of the rolling 18 month period expires and the exam section must be retaken. Provides that a candidate shall retain credit for exam sections passed as a candidate of another state if applicable. Provides that a candidate is considered to have passed the exam once the candidate simultaneously holds credit for each passed section. Provides that the board may extend a term of credit validity under certain circumstances. Provides that the board shall notify eligible candidates of the time, place, and procedures for the exam, or that a candidate shall independently contact the board, the board's designee, or a test center operator to schedule the time, place, and procedures for the exam at an approved site. Provides that these requirements expire on July 1, 2021. Requires the agency to adopt rules to implement the provisions in the bill. Voids certain sections of the Indiana Administrative Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of accountancy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 108
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 320: yeas 80, nays 0
2020-03-04HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 291: yeas 48, nays 2
2020-03-02SenateSenator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2020-01-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-21HouseRepresentative Hatfield added as coauthor
2020-01-21HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon, Ford J.D., Donato
2020-01-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 36: yeas 96, nays 0
2020-01-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2020-01-08HouseCoauthored by Representative VanNatter
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Ellington

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1148/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/0/8/73088e19/HB1148.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/b/a/01ba53f8/HB1148.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/3/4/45342db1/HB1148.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/6/1/9f61c39a/HB1148.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/1/8/d118f682/HB1148.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/1/2/3412a0c5/HB1148.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/f/0/cef09dc6/HB1148.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/8/d/d18d4551/HB1148.36_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/a/9/f4a91b34/HB1148.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/5/e/885ed8fa/HB1148.291_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/4/b/ba4b86c4/HB1148.320_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback