IN HB1148 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the definition of "normal retirement age" in the public employees' defined contribution plan (plan) to reduce the minimum number of years required for participation in the plan from ten years to five years. Requires a vested plan member to be separated from employment for at least 30 days before the member may make a withdrawal from the member's account. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the pension management oversight commission.)
Title
Public employees' defined contribution plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 66 |
2013-04-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 345: yeas 48 and nays 1 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2013-01-23 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Tallian and Boots |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 26: yeas 80, nays 14 |
2013-01-22 | House | Amendment 1 (Niezgodski), failed; voice vote |
2013-01-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2013-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative Burton |
2013-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Niezgodski |