IN HB1141 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Community mental health center funding. Specifies the funding amounts that must be provided by counties to community mental health centers. Provides that a county's maximum funding amount for a year is equal to the maximum funding amount for the previous year multiplied by the percentage change in the county's general fund property tax levy, after subtracting circuit breaker credits (but provides that the maximum funding amount will not be less than the preceding year's maximum funding amount). Phases-in this change in the case of Marion County. Requires the department of local government finance (DLGF) to verify the maximum appropriation calculation
Title
Community mental health center funding. Specifies the funding amounts that must be provided by counties to community mental health centers. Provides that a county's maximum funding amount for a year is equal to the maximum funding amount for the previous year multiplied by the percentage change in the county's general fund property tax levy, after subtracting circuit breaker credits (but provides that the maximum funding amount will not be less than the preceding year's maximum funding amount). Phases-in this change in the case of Marion County. Requires the department of local government finance (DLGF) to verify the maximum appropriation calculation
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Kathy Richardson [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] |
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | House | Public Law 76 |
2018-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 330: yeas 92, nays 2 |
2018-03-05 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-31 | House | Representatives Richardson and Klinker added as coauthors |
2018-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Boots |
2018-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 87: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2018-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-11 | House | Representative Brown, T. added as coauthor |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-08 | House | Authored by Representative Schaibley |