IN HB1134 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that a homeowners association may not adopt or enforce a rule or covenant that prohibits, or has the effect of prohibiting: (1) a candidate; (2) an individual who holds an elected office; (3) the spouse of a candidate or individual who holds an elective office; or (4) a volunteer worker of a candidate or individual who holds an elected office; from entering onto homeowners association property for purposes of conducting political activity.
Title
Political activity on homeowners association property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Roll Call 113403 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Roll Call 113401 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Elections - Roll Call 113403 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Roll Call 113401 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Public Law 73 |
2014-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 404: yeas 62 and nays 19 |
2014-03-03 | House | Representative M. Smith added as coauthor. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 224: yeas 36 and nays 11 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Elections |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Tallian added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Zakas added as first sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 84 and nays 10 |
2014-01-27 | House | Amendment #1 (Smith, M.), prevailed. |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Elections and Apportionment |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative VanDenburgh. |