IN HB1134 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Senator Sipes added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-16 - Senator Sipes added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of test scores as a sole factor to determine teacher employment decisions.
Title
Teacher performance evaluations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | Senator Sipes added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-15 | Senator Mrvan added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse and Rogers | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 141: Yeas 51, Nays 47 | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 1 (Thompson), failed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-07 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-07 | Authored by Representative Porter |