IN HB1133 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: Senate Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
Pending: Senate Public Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a deceased personality's rights of publicity: (1) apply to the personality whether the personality died before, on, or after July 1, 1994 (the original effective date of the rights of publicity law); and (2) if the personality died before July 1, 1994, are considered to have existed on and after the date the personality died. Provides that a personality does not have rights of publicity if the personality has commercial value solely because the personality has been charged with or convicted of a crime.
Title
Rights of publicity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2012-01-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Kenley and Bray | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 135: yeas 85, nays 7 | |
2012-01-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-09 | Coauthored by Representative Foley | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Eberhart |