IN HB1130 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Open meetings. Requires a governing body of a school corporation (school board) to allow each member of the public attending a meeting (attendee) the opportunity to provide oral public comment. Allows a school board to permit oral public comment at a public meeting that is conducted electronically during a state or local disaster emergency. Restricts the circumstances in which the governing body of a state or local public agency may hold a virtual meeting during a declared disaster emergency without any of the governing body members physically present.
Title
Open meetings.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy O'Brien [R] | Rep. Jake Teshka [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Michelle Davis [R] |
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] |
Sen. John Crane [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Qaddoura) failed (Y: 11 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Qaddoura) failed (Y: 11 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Public Law 116 |
2022-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 323: yeas 91, nays 1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 34, nays 11 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 270: yeas 11, nays 39 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Buck) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed back on second reading |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senator Crane added as cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Houchin |
2022-01-25 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Buck, Becker, Messmer |
2022-01-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 72: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2022-01-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-11 | House | Representative Davis M added as coauthor |
2022-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2022-01-04 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Teshka and Bartels |
2022-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative O'Brien |