IN HB1128 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion matters. Requires that a pregnant woman be informed orally and in writing before an abortion obtained through an abortion inducing drug that the abortion may be possibly reversed. Requires certain Internet websites, referral telephone numbers, language stressing that seeking additional information and aid from a local medical professional should be sought as soon as possible, and a statement that no medical study has confirmed that an abortion may be reversed after taking an abortion inducing drug, be included on the informational form. Requires additional information to be reported to the state department of health (state department) by a health

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion matters. Requires that a pregnant woman be informed orally and in writing before an abortion obtained through an abortion inducing drug that the abortion may be possibly reversed. Requires certain Internet websites, referral telephone numbers, language stressing that seeking additional information and aid from a local medical professional should be sought as soon as possible, and a statement that no medical study has confirmed that an abortion may be reversed after taking an abortion inducing drug, be included on the informational form. Requires additional information to be reported to the state department of health (state department) by a health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Amendment #3 (Austin) failed (Y: 33 N: 55 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-01SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-28HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-27HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Brown L and Houchin
2017-02-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 54, nays 41
2017-02-23HouseAmendment #6 (Austin) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-23HouseAmendment #3 (Austin) failed; Roll Call 218: yeas 33, nays 55
2017-02-23HouseAmendment #1 (Errington) prevailed; voice vote
2017-02-23HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-02-21HouseMotion to recommit; defeated; voice vote
2017-02-21HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-12HouseRepresentative Mayfield added as coauthor
2017-01-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2017-01-05HouseAuthored by Representative Bacon

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback