IN HB1123 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 124
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Public Law 124
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits accident and sickness insurance policies and health maintenance organization contracts from providing abortion coverage except in specified circumstances. Allows an insurer or health maintenance organization to provide abortion coverage through a rider or an endorsement.
Title
Abortion coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Insurance - Roll Call 112303 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Insurance - Roll Call 112301 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Insurance - Roll Call 112303 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House Committee on Insurance - Roll Call 112301 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Public Law 124 |
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-10 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 436: yeas 75 and nays 11 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 298: yeas 37 and nays 10 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Insurance |
2014-01-27 | House | Senator Holdman added as third sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Senator R. Young added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Senator Walker added as sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 65: yeas 80 and nays 14 |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-23 | House | Amendment #1 (Thompson), prevailed. |
2014-01-23 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-23 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor. |
2014-01-16 | House | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Insurance |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Thompson. |
2014-01-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative Lehman |