IN HB1116 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that an employer or employer's insurance carrier may not delay the provision of emergency medical care for worker's compensation injuries or occupational disease disablements whenever emergency medical care is considered necessary in the professional judgment of the attending health care facility physician.
Title
Worker's compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 67 | |
2010-03-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 274: Yeas 87, Nays 3 | |
2010-02-23 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 202: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-18 | Senator Walker added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-18 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-15 | Senators Deig and Errington added as cosponsors | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2010-02-02 | Representative Tyler added as coauthor | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Kruse and Tallian | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 148: Yeas 93, Nays 3 | |
2010-02-01 | Amendment 1 (Moseley), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Representative Bartlett added as coauthor | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Labor and Employment | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative Moseley |