IN HB1111 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Utility regulatory commission reporting and rules. Amends the statute concerning the required annual report by the utility regulatory commission (IURC) to the governor and the legislative council as follows: (1) Requires the IURC to present the annual report to the interim study committee on energy, utilities, and telecommunications (committee) before October 1 of each year. (2) Provides that the annual report must include certain information concerning: (A) the energy utility industry; (B) the water and wastewater utility industries; (C) the communications services industry; and (D) Indiana's pipeline safety program. Makes conforming amendments to the statutes requiring the IURC to report annually to the committee concerning: (1) the energy utility industry; and (2) communications services. Makes other conforming amendments to Indiana Code sections referencing the IURC's annual report to the committee concerning communications services. Repeals Indiana Code provisions requiring the IURC to report annually to the committee concerning: (1) acquisitions under the statute concerning acquisitions of offered water or wastewater utilities; and (2) the Indiana voluntary clean energy portfolio standard program. Requires the IURC to adopt rules as the IURC determines necessary to implement Federal Energy Regulatory Commission Order No. 2222 concerning distributed energy resources and distributed energy resource aggregators.
Title
Utility regulatory commission reporting and rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Public Law 71 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senator Zay added as cosponsor |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as cosponsor |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as third sponsor |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senator Leising added as second sponsor |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 216: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as cosponsor |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-18 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch |
2022-01-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 18: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2022-01-13 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor |
2022-01-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-11 | House | Representative Pierce added as coauthor |
2022-01-11 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2022-01-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative Manning |
2022-01-04 | House | Authored by Representative Soliday |