IN HB1111 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Unemployment. Provides a new schedule of rates for calendar years after December 31, 2020. Specifies that Schedule C applies for calendar years 2021 through 2025. Provides new contribution rates for calendar years after 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Moseley) failed (Y: 33 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Beck) failed (Y: 33 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 158
2020-03-21HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 330: yeas 73, nays 0
2020-03-05HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenator Buck added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 286: yeas 48, nays 2
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2020-02-11SenateSenator Doriot added as cosponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2020-01-31HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-30HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Ruckelshaus and Boots
2020-01-30HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 90, nays 3
2020-01-29HouseAmendment #2 (Moseley) failed; Roll Call 120: yeas 33, nays 63
2020-01-29HouseAmendment #1 (Beck) failed; Roll Call 119: yeas 33, nays 63
2020-01-29HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-27HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-14HouseReferred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2020-01-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-08HouseRepresentative Miller added as coauthor
2020-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2020-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Leonard

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1111/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/f/b/9bfbae4b/HB1111.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/0/f/de0fe4c5/HB1111.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/f/f/dbffd2bd/HB1111.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/3/8/dc386ece/HB1111.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/0/f/1c0fe189/HB1111.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/f/6/bdf6c28e/HB1111.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/e/0/7de025c4/HB1111.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/b/4/5bb46daf/HB1111.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/0/1/78012043/HB1111.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/9/f/309f7633/HB1111.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/7/b/557b255d/HB1111.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/1/b/981b1cfa/HB1111.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/4/4/83447e7d/HB1111.119_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/6/4/0c64d57e/HB1111.120_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/0/7/28077d86/HB1111.139_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/9/2/2092dd1d/HB1111.03.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/3/d/f/e3dfd8a3/HB1111.04.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/f/2/f2f27cdc/HB1111.286_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/8/3/3f8343ce/HB1111.330_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback