IN HB1107 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "hydraulic fracturing" and "base fluid" for purposes of the law concerning oil and gas wells. Requires the natural resources commission, in regulating oil and gas wells, to adopt rules for the reporting and disclosure of hydraulic fracturing treatments.
Title
Hydraulic fracturing treatments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-02-27 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-02-21 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-21 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 221: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-02-20 | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-14 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Energy and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsor: Senator Gard | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 151: yeas 95, nays 0 | |
2012-01-30 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Representatives Battles and Ubelhor added as coauthors | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Koch |