IN HB1106 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: rejected by the Senate; Roll Call 360: yeas 19, nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Eminent domain. Makes changes to condemnation proceedings in which appraisers are appointed after December 31, 2022. Requires a city or town to obtain the county executive's approval of a condemnation of property within the unincorporated area of the county, unless the county executive waives review of the condemnation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eminent domain.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 19 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-08SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: rejected by the Senate; Roll Call 360: yeas 19, nays 31
2022-03-08HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 359: yeas 71, nays 19
2022-03-07SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2022-03-07HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2022-03-07SenateSenator Niemeyer added as conferee
2022-03-07SenateSenator Griffin removed as conferee
2022-03-02SenateSenate advisors appointed: Doriot and Pol
2022-03-02SenateSenate conferees appointed: Buck and Griffin
2022-03-02HouseRepresentative Johnson added as advisor
2022-03-02HouseRepresentative Moed added as conferee
2022-03-02HouseRepresentative Johnson removed as conferee
2022-03-02HouseRepresentative Moed removed as advisor
2022-03-02HouseHouse advisors appointed: Soliday, Pressel, Gore and Moed
2022-03-02HouseHouse conferees appointed: Goodrich and Johnson
2022-03-02HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2022-03-02SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2022-03-01HouseMotion to dissent filed
2022-03-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 285: yeas 26, nays 24
2022-02-28SenateAmendment #1 (Pol) failed; voice vote
2022-02-28SenateAmendment #2 (Boehnlein) prevailed; voice vote
2022-02-28SenateAmendment #6 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
2022-02-28SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2022-02-24SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-02-02SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2022-01-26HouseReferred to the Senate
2022-01-25HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Buck and Doriot
2022-01-25HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 97: yeas 66, nays 24
2022-01-24HouseRepresentative Moed added as coauthor
2022-01-24HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2022-01-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-01-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2022-01-04HouseCoauthored by Representatives Hostettler and Prescott
2022-01-04HouseAuthored by Representative Goodrich

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/house/1106/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/f/3/a7f3ef27/HB1106.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/2/f/612f21f9/HB1106.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/5/9/8/05980dec/HB1106.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/9/5/f795640d/HB1106.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/3/8/8a386ee7/HB1106.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/2/d/bc2da776/HB1106.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/2/e/6f2e0851/HB1106.04.ENGS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/9/7/b697eb79/HB1106.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/7/4/5e749ee6/HB1106.03.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/3/b/0a3bb494/HB1106.03.COMS.AMS003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/e/9/08e984cc/HB1106.03.COMS.AMS004.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/5/2/f452fd66/HB1106.03.COMS.AMS005.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/f/b/46fb300b/HB1106.03.COMS.AMS006.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/4/b/e94b3548/HB1106.03.COMS.AMS007.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/1/e/6e1e3ede/HB1106.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/1/3/7b135301/HB1106.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/5/4/c054b24a/HB1106.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/4/a/0c4a66a6/HB1106.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/9/9/f699ce36/HB1106.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/f/a/f7fadb0f/HB1106.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/f/2/23f2951d/HB1106.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/4/9/2049dbd2/HB1106.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/4/9/094982fb/HB1106.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/9/8/1a98c81e/HB1106.04.ENGS.DIS01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/f/6/c6f6c20b/HB1106.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/a/c/97acf44b/HB1106.97_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/4/7/0d471b64/HB1106.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/e/c/a0ec0ee8/HB1106.285_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/f/3/e9f3407b/HB1106.359_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/4/0/5b40a267/HB1106.360_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback