IN HB1105 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 70
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prosecutions for rape and criminal deviate conduct. Specifies that certain exceptions to the statute of limitations for rape as a Level 3 felony also apply to rape as a Class B felony (for crimes committed before July 1, 2014). Provides that a prosecution for criminal deviate conduct as a Class B felony for an offense committed before the crime was repealed on July 1, 2014, that would otherwise be barred may be commenced not later than five years after the earliest of the date on which: (1) the state first discovers evidence sufficient to charge the offender with the offense
Title
Prosecutions for rape and criminal deviate conduct. Specifies that certain exceptions to the statute of limitations for rape as a Level 3 felony also apply to rape as a Class B felony (for crimes committed before July 1, 2014). Provides that a prosecution for criminal deviate conduct as a Class B felony for an offense committed before the crime was repealed on July 1, 2014, that would otherwise be barred may be commenced not later than five years after the earliest of the date on which: (1) the state first discovers evidence sufficient to charge the offender with the offense
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Public Law 70 |
2016-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 387: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Dissent withdrawn |
2016-03-04 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Bassler, Taylor and Charbonneau |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Crider and Lanane |
2016-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Washburne, Kirchhofer, McNamara and Porter |
2016-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Olthoff and Hale |
2016-03-03 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 258: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as cosponsor |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as second sponsor |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-26 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Crider |
2016-01-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 64: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative McNamara added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | House | Representatives Olthoff and Kirchhofer added as coauthors |
2016-01-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2016-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Hale |