IN HB1104 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Housing and community development authority. Repeals the laws governing the microenterprise partnership program fund and microenterprise partnership program. Requires the governing body of an eligible entity to notify the Indiana housing and community development authority of the creation of an affordable housing fund. Replaces the member of the low income housing trust fund advisory committee appointed by and representing the Indianapolis Coalition for Neighborhood Development with one member appointed by and representing the Indiana housing and community development authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing and community development authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 17
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-02-25SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-02-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 222: yeas 48, nays 0
2020-02-20SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-17SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2020-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-23HouseRepresentatives Pressel, Miller, Bartlett added as coauthors
2020-01-23HouseCosponsor: Senator Taylor G
2020-01-23HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Garten, Messmer, Rogers
2020-01-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 45: yeas 95, nays 0
2020-01-21HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-16HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2020-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1104/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/6/4/90646a1b/HB1104.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/f/7/6af7bf44/HB1104.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/8/1/3c8142a0/HB1104.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/6/2/e6623290/HB1104.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/6/b/b06b6196/HB1104.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/7/0/a370b463/HB1104.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/3/f/ac3fd8d3/HB1104.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/9/7/099700e6/HB1104.45_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/4/6/5d469e7c/HB1104.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/b/3/08b3c63e/HB1104.222_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback