IN HB1097 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Signed by the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal penalties. Provides that a person who uses a vehicle to commit the offense of resisting law enforcement or interfering with public safety, and has a prior conviction for either offense that involved the use of a vehicle, commits a Level 5 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 53 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 76 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 445: yeas 53, nays 28
2021-04-14HouseMotion to concur filed
2021-04-14SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-13SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 413: yeas 45, nays 4
2021-04-12SenateAmendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-12SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-04-08SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-24SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-22HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Glick, Koch, Sandlin
2021-02-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 76, nays 17
2021-02-18HouseAmendment #1 (Abbott) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-17HouseRepresentative Morris added as coauthor
2021-02-17HouseRepresentatives McNamara and Carbaugh added as coauthors
2021-02-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Abbott

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1097/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/2/3/a323e947/HB1097.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/c/6/b2c62be5/HB1097.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/a/7/caa75323/HB1097.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/5/0/29506af9/HB1097.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/1/8/f018c26c/HB1097.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/6/3/546302fc/HB1097.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/0/8/2508f4ef/HB1097.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/d/2/0ad227ac/HB1097.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/e/5/dfe5c2ee/HB1097.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/3/f/153fe13d/HB1097.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/c/f/17cf832c/HB1097.06.ENRS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/9/e/f49e194d/HB1097.02.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/4/5/f445fecc/HB1097.02.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/2/7/49279a85/HB1097.04.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/0/1/39011761/HB1097.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/b/1/8ab1cee9/HB1097.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/2/4/5c240f77/HB1097.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/e/3/5ae3331c/HB1097.03.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/7/f/697fa82d/HB1097.03.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/f/2/60f292e8/HB1097.03.ENGH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/3/a/483a6b85/HB1097.04.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/5/a/325a9945/HB1097.05.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/a/8/28a851c3/HB1097.05.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/8/8/0a883fa1/HB1097.05.ENGS.CON01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/1/8/e4188251/HB1097.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/f/a/78fa58fa/HB1097.230_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/f/b/fcfbb2c8/HB1097.03.ENGH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/a/c/9eacfbfc/HB1097.413_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/4/e/f14eb5c7/HB1097.445_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback