IN HB1097 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Representative Klinker added as coauthor
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Foreclosure counseling and education fee. Extends from July 1, 2017, to July 1, 2019, the date for the expiration of the $50 mortgage foreclosure counseling and education fee that must be paid by a party filing an action to foreclose a mortgage. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foreclosure counseling and education fee. Extends from July 1, 2017, to July 1, 2019, the date for the expiration of the $50 mortgage foreclosure counseling and education fee that must be paid by a party filing an action to foreclose a mortgage. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-02HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2017-01-12HouseRepresentatives Hamilton and Davisson added as coauthors
2017-01-05HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-01-05HouseAuthored by Representative Burton

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback