IN HB1090 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-03 - Referred to committee on Courts and Criminal Code pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-03 - Referred to committee on Courts and Criminal Code pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Expanded criminal history checks for drivers for hire. Requires a transportation network company, a taxicab company, or a taxicab service (company) to request and receive an expanded criminal history check and a certified copy of the driving record (check) of a driver or taxicab driver (driver) before a driver begins employment or association with the company. Makes it a Class A infraction for a company to allow a driver to operate a motor vehicle or taxicab if the driver has been convicted of: (1) certain felonies or misdemeanors; or (2) certain motor vehicle offenses. Makes it a Class A infraction
Title
Expanded criminal history checks for drivers for hire. Requires a transportation network company, a taxicab company, or a taxicab service (company) to request and receive an expanded criminal history check and a certified copy of the driving record (check) of a driver or taxicab driver (driver) before a driver begins employment or association with the company. Makes it a Class A infraction for a company to allow a driver to operate a motor vehicle or taxicab if the driver has been convicted of: (1) certain felonies or misdemeanors; or (2) certain motor vehicle offenses. Makes it a Class A infraction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-27 - House - House Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to committee on Courts and Criminal Code pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-01-27 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as coauthor |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-12 | House | Representatives Gutwein and Lehman added as coauthors |
2015-01-06 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2015-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Hale |