IN HB1085 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Public Law 186
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rescue actions. Amends an Indiana Code section requiring an emergency medical services provider to take custody of a newborn child under certain circumstances to eliminate an ambiguity that might otherwise exist with respect to one of the circumstances under which the requirement applies. Provides that a person who forcibly enters a motor vehicle to remove a domestic animal is responsible for only one-half of the cost of repairing the motor vehicle damage directly caused by the person's forcible entry and is immune from all other civil or criminal liability for other property damage resulting from the forcible entry if the
Title
Rescue actions. Amends an Indiana Code section requiring an emergency medical services provider to take custody of a newborn child under certain circumstances to eliminate an ambiguity that might otherwise exist with respect to one of the circumstances under which the requirement applies. Provides that a person who forcibly enters a motor vehicle to remove a domestic animal is responsible for only one-half of the cost of repairing the motor vehicle damage directly caused by the person's forcible entry and is immune from all other civil or criminal liability for other property damage resulting from the forcible entry if the
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Linda Lawson [D] | Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] | Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] |
Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Public Law 186 |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate |
2017-04-21 | House | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 508: yeas 43, nays 7 |
2017-04-21 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 519: yeas 72, nays 27 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2017-04-20 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Houchin and Taylor G |
2017-04-11 | House | House advisors appointed: Washburne, Young J and Dvorak |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Hershman and Randolph Lonnie M |
2017-04-11 | House | House conferees appointed: Cook and Lawson L |
2017-04-10 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 408: yeas 39, nays 9 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as second sponsor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2017-02-20 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2017-02-13 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Hershman |
2017-02-13 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 80, nays 14 |
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Representative Karickhoff added as coauthor |
2017-02-02 | House | Representative Schaibley added as coauthor |
2017-01-10 | House | Representative Lawson added as coauthor |
2017-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Cook |