IN HB1084 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Identification through surgical implants. Allows a coroner to positively identify a dead person by tracking a unique identifying number on a surgically implanted medical device in the dead person's body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Identification through surgical implants. Allows a coroner to positively identify a dead person by tracking a unique identifying number on a surgically implanted medical device in the dead person's body.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HousePublic Law 45
2019-04-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-28SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-28HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-20SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2019-03-19SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 283: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-03-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-14SenateSenator Busch added as cosponsor
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-11SenateSenator Brown L added as second sponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-22HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Ford Jon
2019-01-22HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 20: yeas 97, nays 1
2019-01-17HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-10HouseRepresentative Hatfield added as coauthor
2019-01-07HouseRepresentative Bacon added as coauthor
2019-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-03HouseCoauthored by Representative Lehman
2019-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative Morrison

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1084/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/b/f/c8bf9da7/HB1084.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/d/3/b4d35662/HB1084.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/3/9/073972dd/HB1084.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/b/f/d8bf0869/HB1084.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/5/0/ba5066fa/HB1084.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/3/d/993d71e7/HB1084.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/6/6/1a663c6e/HB1084.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/3/3/6a33fc9c/HB1084.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/b/a/7aba52db/HB1084.20.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/8/2/9082e8f9/HB1084.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/b/e/c/8bec8368/HB1084.283.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback