IN HB1082 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Various higher education matters. Makes changes to the: (1) definition of "eligible secondary school student"; and (2) requirements regarding agreements between the commission for higher education (commission) and eligible employers; for purposes of the employment aid readiness network (EARN) Indiana program. Makes changes to the name of the "return and complete" project. Makes changes to the definitions regarding the project, including repealing definitions regarding the return and complete project. Requires the commission to: (1) collect and maintain certain information regarding the project; and (2) submit a report to the general assembly and governor regarding the information. Provides that money in the graduate medical education fund does not revert to any other fund. (Current law provides that money in the graduate medical education fund does not revert to the state general fund.) Repeals provisions that do the following: (1) Require state educational institutions to report annually to the commission regarding return and complete students. (2) Expire the return and complete project provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various higher education matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 31 N: 60 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 37
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 303: yeas 91, nays 0
2020-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-25SenateSenator Grooms added as second sponsor
2020-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 239: yeas 46, nays 0
2020-02-24SenateSenator Raatz added as cosponsor
2020-02-24SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateSenator Melton added as cosponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Ford Jon
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 97, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 70: yeas 31, nays 60
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-16HouseRepresentative Pfaff added as coauthor
2020-01-14HouseRepresentative May added as coauthor
2020-01-09HouseRepresentative DeVon added as coauthor
2020-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Heaton

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1082/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/3/d/f43d0a89/HB1082.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/c/2/a6c200ce/HB1082.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/e/5/a7e58f86/HB1082.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/7/9/ed790cad/HB1082.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/b/6/22b67592/HB1082.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/c/a/98cae134/HB1082.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/6/e/2b6ee5f9/HB1082.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/6/2/ec62b095/HB1082.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/e/f/c7efeef5/HB1082.70_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/0/b/c70b5b6f/HB1082.80_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/5/0/cd503e3b/HB1082.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/b/1/d2b1ddff/HB1082.239_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/1/a/b01a6f8e/HB1082.303_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback