IN HB1078 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 240
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commitment of Level 6 offenders to DOC. Provides that a court may commit a person convicted of a Level 6 felony to the department of correction (DOC) if: (1) the person is a violent offender; or (2) the person has two prior unrelated felony convictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commitment of Level 6 offenders to DOC. Provides that a court may commit a person convicted of a Level 6 felony to the department of correction (DOC) if: (1) the person is a violent offender; or (2) the person has two prior unrelated felony convictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-09 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 240
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-23HouseHouse reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 592: yeas 94, nays 2
2019-04-22HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-22HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-22HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-22HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Freeman, Tallian and Zay
2019-04-11SenateSenate conferees appointed: Young M and Randolph Lonnie M
2019-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Lauer, Young J, Hatcher and Pierce
2019-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Goodin
2019-04-09HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-09HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-03-29SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 341: yeas 46, nays 2
2019-03-26SenateAmendment #3 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-26SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-21SenatePlaced back on second reading
2019-03-19SenateAmendment #2 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2019-03-19SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-12SenateSenator Zay added as cosponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2019-01-16HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-15HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Young M, Freeman and Houchin
2019-01-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 10: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-01-14HouseRepresentatives Mahan and Goodin added as coauthors
2019-01-14HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-10HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-07HouseRepresentative McNamara added as coauthor
2019-01-03HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2019-01-03HouseAuthored by Representative Steuerwald

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1078/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/4/1/ba41dce3/HB1078.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/b/e/4ebe0759/HB1078.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/0/f/170f2cb2/HB1078.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/c/3/82c3d8f6/HB1078.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/6/1/d6618715/HB1078.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/6/9/c169b62f/HB1078.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/a/f/1aafdf3c/HB1078.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/f/8/22f83a28/HB1078.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/5/6/815613a4/HB1078.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/6/e/416eb32d/HB1078.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/5/6/0e56bceb/HB1078.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/a/e/c5ae2137/HB1078.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/0/9/6d09705f/HB1078.10.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/5/a/655a0a73/HB1078.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/1/4/a7145a02/HB1078.341.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/f/e/befe0368/HB1078.592.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback