IN HB1078 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - Senator Lewis added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises provisions governing the use of golf carts on certain county roads. Provides that an ordinance authorizing the use of golf carts on county roads must require that: (1) an individual who operates a golf cart on a county road hold a driver's license; and (2) a fine assessed for a violation of the ordinance be deposited in the general fund of the county. Specifies that the violation of an ordinance governing the use of a golf cart on a state highway in the county is considered an ordinance violation (instead of a Class C infraction). Requires a collector snowmobile to be registered with the department of natural resources in order to be operated on public property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle matters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-11 Senator Lewis added as cosponsor
2010-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation & Veterans Affairs
2010-01-20 Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Stutzman
2010-01-20 Referred to the Senate
2010-01-20 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 38: Yeas 91, Nays 1
2010-01-19 Amendment 7 (Bell), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-19 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-12 Representative Duncan added as coauthor
2010-01-12 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-07 Representative Lehman added as coauthor
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2010-01-05 Authored by Representative Dembowski

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback