IN HB1077 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-28 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Healthy food financing program. Establishes the healthy food financing fund (fund) and healthy food financing program (program) under the administration of the Indiana housing and community development authority (IHCDA). Provides that the purpose of the fund is to provide financing in the form of loans or grants for projects that increase the availability of fresh and nutritious food in underserved communities. Defines an "underserved community" as a census tract determined to be an area with low supermarket access: (1) by the United States Department of Agriculture; or (2) as identified through a methodology used by another healthy food initiative. Provides
Title
Healthy food financing program. Establishes the healthy food financing fund (fund) and healthy food financing program (program) under the administration of the Indiana housing and community development authority (IHCDA). Provides that the purpose of the fund is to provide financing in the form of loans or grants for projects that increase the availability of fresh and nutritious food in underserved communities. Defines an "underserved community" as a census tract determined to be an area with low supermarket access: (1) by the United States Department of Agriculture; or (2) as identified through a methodology used by another healthy food initiative. Provides
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative Bacon added as coauthor |
2016-01-14 | House | Representatives Summers and Davisson added as coauthors |
2016-01-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2016-01-05 | House | Authored by Representative Shackleford |