IN HB1070 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Distracted driving. Provides that, except in certain circumstances, a person may not hold or use a telecommunications device while operating a moving motor vehicle. Removes prohibitions on typing, transmitting, or reading a text message or an electronic mail message while operating a moving motor vehicle. Provides that the bureau may not assess points under the point system for a violation occurring before July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distracted driving.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 100
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-10SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 354: yeas 49, nays 1
2020-03-10HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 341: yeas 81, nays 11
2020-03-09SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2020-03-09HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Grooms, Ford J.D., Ford Jon and Mrvan
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Crider and Niezgodski
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Morris, Pressel, Vermilion, Goodrich, Lauer, Chyung and Deal
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Sullivan and Candelaria Reardon
2020-03-04HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-25SenateSenator Kruse added as cosponsor
2020-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 237: yeas 43, nays 4
2020-02-24SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-24SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-20SenateSenators Rogers and Niezgodski added as cosponsors
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-17SenateSenator Ford Jon added as cosponsor
2020-02-11SenateSenators Mrvan and Ford J.D. added as cosponsors
2020-02-10SenateSenator Grooms added as second sponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2020-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-29HouseRepresentative Candelaria Reardon added as coauthor
2020-01-29HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2020-01-29HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2020-01-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 128: yeas 86, nays 10
2020-01-28HouseRepresentative Schaibley added as coauthor
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-16HouseRepresentative Karickhoff added as coauthor
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2020-01-13HouseCoauthored by Representative Pressel
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Sullivan

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1070/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/6/6/9b66598d/HB1070.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/b/6/6ab657f2/HB1070.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/b/2/53b25a16/HB1070.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/9/b/df9bc113/HB1070.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/5/d/645d1e75/HB1070.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/5/4/b754c43c/HB1070.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/d/b/89db916a/HB1070.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/1/4/ce148139/HB1070.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/3/0/ce30a474/HB1070.128_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/d/0/cfd0359c/HB1070.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/e/1/d7e1c8cf/HB1070.237_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/9/3/129387b3/HB1070.341_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/6/8/ae685a90/HB1070.354_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback