IN HB1070 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of correction (department) ombudsman (ombudsman) to create a monthly report that includes a summary of the findings of all substantiated complaints. Provides that the ombudsman may conduct investigations of alleged violations of department policy, state or federal laws, and department administrative rules at any department facility. Provides that the ombudsman may recommend changes to the commissioner of the department concerning department policies or practices.
Title
Department of correction ombudsman.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House - Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 107002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 107001 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 107002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Roll Call 107001 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | Public Law 69 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-04 | House | Motion to Concur in Senate Amendments: prevailed, Roll Call 390: yeas 89 and nays 0 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 211: yeas 44 and nays 0 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | HB 1070 Amendment #1 (Taylor), prevailed. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 77: yeas 92 and nays 0 |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Young R Michael added as sponsor. |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-27 | House | Representative DeLaney added as coauthor. |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Mayfield. |