IN HB1063 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 99
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 99
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety officer death benefits. Increases, from $150,000 to $225,000, the special death benefit for certain public safety officers, certain motor carrier inspectors, certain special police employees, members of the 1925 police pension fund, the 1937 firefighters' pension fund, the 1953 police pension fund, and the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund who die in the line of duty after June 30, 2020. Provides that the board shall determine contributions and contribution rates for individual employers or for a group of employers necessary to adequately maintain the special death benefit fund. Provides that, for certain police officers, firefighters, and emergency medical services providers, the cost of the coverage is in addition to the contribution determined by the board.
Title
Public safety officer death benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Goodin) failed (Y: 37 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Goodin) failed (Y: 37 N: 57 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Public Law 99 |
2020-03-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 318: yeas 82, nays 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senator Sandlin added as cosponsor |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as cosponsor |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 281: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senators Spartz, Garten, Ford J.D. added as cosponsors |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senator Boots added as second sponsor |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Doriot |
2020-01-30 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 148: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | Amendment #1 (Goodin) failed; Roll Call 116: yeas 37, nays 57 |
2020-01-29 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-27 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-23 | House | Representatives VanNatter and Harris added as coauthors |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2020-01-16 | House | Authored by Representative Goodrich |