IN HB1062 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the uniform enforcement of foreign judgments act to permit the enforcement of a judgment of another state upon filing the judgment in the office of the clerk of the court.
Title
Uniform enforcement of foreign judgments act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 63 | |
2010-03-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 265: Yeas 92, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-22 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 186: Yeas 50 and Nays 0 | |
2010-02-18 | Amendment 1 (Randolph), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-18 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-11 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-26 | Senate sponsors: Senators Bray and Lanane | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-26 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 68: Yeas 96, Nays 0 | |
2010-01-25 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Representatives Dvorak, Foley and Koch added as coauthors | |
2010-01-20 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Representative VanHaaften |