IN HB1058 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the attorney general to bring an action against the board of directors of a homeowners association or individual members of a homeowners association if the attorney general makes certain findings. Provides for judicial remedies for violations of the statute governing homeowners associations.
Title
Homeowners associations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 49 | |
2011-04-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-12 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-07 | Senators Delph and Grooms added as cosponsors | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2011-04-07 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 313: yeas 49 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-05 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-31 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Senators Zakas and R. Young added as cosponsors | |
2011-02-17 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters | |
2011-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Bray and Yoder | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 47: yeas 90, nays 8 | |
2011-01-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-24 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-10 | Representative Hinkle added as coauthor | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Representative Cheatham |