IN HB1057 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Indiana department of transportation (INDOT) to adopt rules concerning distances for maintaining an unobstructed view within (rather than from) a railroad right-of-way. Provides that a rule adopted by INDOT concerning distances for unobstructed views within railroad rights-of-way replaces any common law duties imposed on a railroad with respect to the distances established under the rule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unobstructed views at railroad crossings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs - Roll Call 105702 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-08 - House - House Committee on Roads and Transportation - Roll Call 105701 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-27HousePublic Law 205
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-04SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-02-24SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2014-02-24SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 221: yeas 46 and nays 0
2014-02-24SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor.
2014-02-20SenateSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-18SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs
2014-01-15HouseRepresentative DeLaney added as coauthor.
2014-01-15HouseRepresentative Bacon added as coauthor.
2014-01-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 15: yeas 91 and nays 2
2014-01-14HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-14HouseSenator Bray added as first sponsor.
2014-01-14HouseSenator Arnold added as second sponsor.
2014-01-13HouseSecond reading: engrossed
2014-01-09HouseCommittee report: do pass amend, adopted.
2014-01-07HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Roads and Transportation
2014-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Slager

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1057/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/f/d/72fda67a/HB1057.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/4/f/7/b4f767c9/HB1057.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/4/9/3649882b/HB1057.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/7/0/2c709d32/HB1057.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/f/e/c1fe6a1b/HB1057.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/8/d/0e8d2aca/HB1057.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/3/9/d739de19/HB1057.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/2/8/1e281a3b/HB1057.02.COMH.15.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/1/0/551039ad/HB1057.02.COMH.15.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/9/1/c291609c/HB1057.02.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/9/9/f299dc0d/HB1057.03.COMS.221.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback