IN HB1053 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that certain levee districts or associations that were created under a statute that was repealed and were allowed to continue after the statute was repealed are subject to the laws concerning levee associations.
Title
Levee associations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 105302 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Roll Call 105301 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources - Roll Call 105302 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Floor - (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Committee on Natural Resources - Roll Call 105301 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-25 | House | Public Law 118 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 220: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-02-03 | House | Senator Yoder added as sponsor. |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 173: yeas 93 and nays 0 |
2014-01-30 | House | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-07 | House | First Reading: Referred to Natural Resources |
2014-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Messmer |